judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: PAUL WATKINS v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING MEDICAL COMMISSION and WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-10-0129)
Case Number:S-10-0129Case Docketed On:06/08/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: PAUL WATKINS v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING MEDICAL COMMISSION and WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: PAUL WATKINS, Appellant (Claimant), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING MEDICAL COMMISSION and WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPaul WatkinsWilliam G. Hibbler
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey
Kelly Roseberry
AppelleeWorkers' Compensation Medical CommissionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey
Kelly Roseberry

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2011 WY 49
Citation:250 P.3d 1082

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/08/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/08/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/08/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/08/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - Copy of Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed in District CourtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
07/21/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/21/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/03/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/03/2010Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/10/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
09/22/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
09/22/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/01/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/03/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
03/21/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the Court, Justice Hill filed a dissenting opinionOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/23/2011Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
03/24/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Combined Application and Motion for Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs, Verification Supporting Same and Notice of Objection.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/12/2011Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
04/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/12/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/12/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/15/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/13/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal