judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EVERETT M. CHARGER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0122)
Case Number:S-10-0122Case Docketed On:06/03/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:EVERETT M. CHARGER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:EVERETT M. CHARGER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantEverett M. ChargerDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/03/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/03/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/03/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/21/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/21/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/22/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/23/2010Brief - Failure to file - appellantBriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
08/23/2010Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
08/23/2010Event - Phone Call - Public Defender's office re waiver, received in mail today. Counsel will e-file waiver and send original for Court file.EventPhone CallFinal
08/23/2010Notice-Incoming - Waiver of appealNotice-IncomingWaiver of appealFinal
08/24/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Waiver of AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/08/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal