judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SHARONDA BURRELL V. BARAC COMPANY

Case Information: 11-CV-0486
Short Caption:SHARONDA BURRELL V. BARAC COMPANYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB16922-08Filed Date:03/28/2011

Opening Event Date:03/28/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/06/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/11/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSharonda Burrell N
Gabriel RottmanNN
AppelleeBarac Company (the)N
Lisa J. DesselNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/28/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/27/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on March 28, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non- appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
05/12/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 2/25/11) (elp)
06/01/2011FiledSupplemental Record #1 (10 pgs/Tape/2-25-11 proc.)
06/06/2011RECORD INDEX
06/06/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/10/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/12/2011FiledStipulation To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant Burrell, Appellee Barac Company (the))
09/19/2011FiledOrder Granting Appellant's Voluntary Motion to Dismiss Appeal (Stipulation of Dismissal)
09/19/2011FiledDismissed
10/11/2011FiledMandate