judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MILLER (JACK) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33609
Short Caption:MILLER (JACK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR982450Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/14/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-00254
01/14/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/26/1999Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order appointing Washoe County Public Defender's Office as counsel on appeal filed in district court on 1/25/99. 99-00551
01/28/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Carolyn Tanner shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. 99-00591
03/08/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-01596
03/08/1999AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 99-01597
03/17/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-01929
04/16/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99A-WM/DA/NB 99-02993
05/12/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-03834
05/12/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/25/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 18, 1999. 99-03834