judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CARL S. OLSEN v. CANDY M. OLSEN

Case Heading (S-10-0121)
Case Number:S-10-0121Case Docketed On:06/01/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:CARL S. OLSEN v. CANDY M. OLSEN
Full Title:CARL S. OLSEN, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. CANDY M. OLSEN, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCarl S. Olsen Pro Se
AppelleeCandy M. Olsen Pro Se

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Child Custody/Visitation, Marriage and Divorce - Property Division
Opinion Number:2011 WY 30
Citation:247 P.3d 77 (Wyo. 2010)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/01/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/01/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court. Appellant attached notice of intent to comply with Wyo. R. App. P. 3.03, no Statement of Evidence filedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/01/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/16/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/23/2010Correspondence - Incoming letter regarding representation of Appellee. Called counsel and notified her that she will need to file a motion to withdraw in the Supreme CourtCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
09/03/2010Brief - Failure to file - appelleeBriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
09/13/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
09/13/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/13/2010Notice-Internal - Other - No motion to withdraw as counsel filed. Removed Ms. Zubrod from case and added Appellee as pro-se.Notice-InternalOtherFinal
09/20/2010Record - Transmitted record on appealRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/20/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/27/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
11/03/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
02/23/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirmed in part and reversed in part, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/11/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/11/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/11/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/11/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/15/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/14/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal