judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DARNELL STANLEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0485
Short Caption:DARNELL STANLEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL6619-93Filed Date:04/18/2011

Opening Event Date:04/18/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/05/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/12/2011
Argued/Submitted:12/14/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/01/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDarnell Stanley YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Mona A. Sahaf YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/18/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/26/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on April 18, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
05/05/2011RECORD INDEX
05/05/2011RECORD COPIES
05/05/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/25/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
06/23/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (Titled, Motion to Reinstate the Court's Order dated 5/25/11, etc.)
07/05/2011RECEIVED Appellant's Brief (maxb still pend).
07/05/2011RECEIVED Appendix to Appellant's Brief (maxb still pend).
07/13/2011FiledOn consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, and the lodged brief and limited appendix, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee_ shall be filed with this court within 30 days from the date of this order. (dfe)
07/13/2011FiledBrief of appellant (Appellant)
07/13/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
08/12/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/12/2011FiledBriefing Completed
09/26/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
10/18/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
11/03/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/17/2011FiledMotion To Appoint Counsel (Appellant)
12/01/2011FiledOrder Denying pro se aplt's motion for appointment of counsel and oral argument.
12/07/2011FiledMotion Requesting Argument on the Summary Calendar (Appellant)
12/14/2011FiledSubmitted before Newman, Belson, Schwelb
12/29/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ)
01/12/2012FiledOrder Denying as moot aplt's second motion for oral argument
01/23/2012FiledMandate
02/08/2012FiledMotion Requesting the court to Vacate 12/29/11 Order and Enter an Order to Reinstate Order that Appellant May Proceed to File a Timely Motion Pursuant to Rule 40. (Appellant)
02/14/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET to file appellant's pro se petition for reh/reh en banc on or before March 8, 2012.
03/08/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
04/23/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's pro se petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc
05/01/2012FiledMandate
05/24/2012FiledCopy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
07/02/2012FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)