judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TERRY CASH; RICHARD J. MATURI; CRAIG McCUNE and RHONDA McCUNE; and RICH NELSON and REBECCA HILLIKER v. GRANITE SPRINGS RETREAT ASSOCIATION, INC., a Wyoming Nonprofit Corporation; LYNN WILLIAMS-HAAS; TED and EMMA ESQUIBEL; J.T. and AIMEE WALSH; JOHN and SYLVIA PASSEHL; MARTY and GAIL GILL; CHERYL and DOUG BROWN; JACQUE CASH; MARY MATURI; CRAIG FOLSOM and APRIL WALTON; MIKE TRENAM; BEN HILSEN and SUSAN JENNELLY; MICHAEL DUSKIN; TIM and LYNN BABBITT; MICHAEL EMERSON; SCOTT SMITH and DEB BAUMER; RICHARD W. MAGILL, Jr. and TRACY FARRELL; TED and JAN LYDIGSEN; CJ and DAVID DI PIETRA; JOE and CINDY MAREK; DARRELL and DOROTHY BAN; DON and BARBARA SULLIVAN; ROB and NICOLE FARNHAM; GARY and JO ELLEN MASS; DAVE BILSKI; BOB LICK and JOANNE STEANE; PETE and NANCY FILLION; DAVE and MELISSA BRUMBAUGH; JOHN and LESLEY ZIMMERMAN; JERRY and KRISTEN PETERSON; MIKE and CHRIS CALTAGIRONE

Case Heading (S-10-0117)
Case Number:S-10-0117Case Docketed On:05/26/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:TERRY CASH; RICHARD J. MATURI; CRAIG McCUNE and RHONDA McCUNE; and RICH NELSON and REBECCA HILLIKER v. GRANITE SPRINGS RETREAT ASSOCIATION, INC., a Wyoming Nonprofit Corporation; LYNN WILLIAMS-HAAS; TED and EMMA ESQUIBEL; J.T. and AIMEE WALSH; JOHN and SYLVIA PASSEHL; MARTY and GAIL GILL; CHERYL and DOUG BROWN; JACQUE CASH; MARY MATURI; CRAIG FOLSOM and APRIL WALTON; MIKE TRENAM; BEN HILSEN and SUSAN JENNELLY; MICHAEL DUSKIN; TIM and LYNN BABBITT; MICHAEL EMERSON; SCOTT SMITH and DEB BAUMER; RICHARD W. MAGILL, Jr. and TRACY FARRELL; TED and JAN LYDIGSEN; CJ and DAVID DI PIETRA; JOE and CINDY MAREK; DARRELL and DOROTHY BAN; DON and BARBARA SULLIVAN; ROB and NICOLE FARNHAM; GARY and JO ELLEN MASS; DAVE BILSKI; BOB LICK and JOANNE STEANE; PETE and NANCY FILLION; DAVE and MELISSA BRUMBAUGH; JOHN and LESLEY ZIMMERMAN; JERRY and KRISTEN PETERSON; MIKE and CHRIS CALTAGIRONE
Full Title:TERRY CASH; RICHARD J. MATURI; CRAIG McCUNE and RHONDA McCUNE; and RICH NELSON and REBECCA HILLIKER, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. GRANITE SPRINGS RETREAT ASSOCIATION, INC., a Wyoming Nonprofit Corporation; LYNN WILLIAMS-HAAS; TED and EMMA ESQUIBEL; J.T. and AIMEE WALSH; JOHN and SYLVIA PASSEHL; MARTY and GAIL GILL; CHERYL and DOUG BROWN; JACQUE CASH; MARY MATURI; CRAIG FOLSOM and APRIL WALTON; MIKE TRENAM; BEN HILSEN and SUSAN JENNELLY; MICHAEL DUSKIN; TIM and LYNN BABBITT; MICHAEL EMERSON; SCOTT SMITH and DEB BAUMER; RICHARD W. MAGILL, Jr. and TRACY FARRELL; TED and JAN LYDIGSEN; CJ and DAVID DI PIETRA; JOE and CINDY MAREK; DARRELL and DOROTHY BAN; DON and BARBARA SULLIVAN; ROB and NICOLE FARNHAM; GARY and JO ELLEN MASS; DAVE BILSKI; BOB LICK and JOANNE STEANE; PETE and NANCY FILLION; DAVE and MELISSA BRUMBAUGH; JOHN and LESLEY ZIMMERMAN; JERRY and KRISTEN PETERSON; MIKE and CHRIS CALTAGIRONE, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTerry CashDaniel Barry Frank
AppellantRichard J. MaturiDaniel Barry Frank
AppellantCraig McCuneDaniel Barry Frank
AppellantRhonda McCuneDaniel Barry Frank
AppellantRich NelsonDaniel Barry Frank
AppellantRebecca HillikerDaniel Barry Frank
AppelleeGranite Springs Retreat Association, Inc.Catherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeLynn Williams-Haas Pro Se
AppelleeTed Esquibel Pro Se
AppelleeEmma Esquibel Pro Se
AppelleeJ.T. WalshWilliam L. Hiser
AppelleeAimee WalshWilliam L. Hiser
AppelleeJohn PassehlCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeSylvia PassehlCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeMarty GillCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeCheryl BrownCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeDoug BrownCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeJacque Cash Pro Se
AppelleeMary Maturi Pro Se
AppelleeCraig FolsomCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeApril WaltonCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeMike TrenamCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeBen HilsenCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeSusan JennellyCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeMichael DuskinCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeTim BabbittCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeLynn BabbittCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeMichael EmersonCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeScott William SmithCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeDeborah A. BaumerCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeRichard W. Magill Jr.Catherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeTracy FarrellCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeTed LydigsenCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeJan LydigsenCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeCJ Di PietraCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeDavid Di PietraCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeJoe MarekCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeCindy MarekCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeDarrell BanCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeDorothy BanCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeDon SullivanCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeBarbara SullivanCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeRob FarnhamCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeNicole FarnhamCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeGary MassCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeJo Ellen MassCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeDave BilskiCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeJoanne SteaneCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleePete FillionCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeNancy FillionCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeDave BrumbaughCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeMelissa BrumbaughCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeJohn ZimmermanCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeLesley ZimmermanCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeJerry PetersonCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeKristen PetersonCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeMike CaltagironeCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeChris CaltagironeCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeBob LickCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeGail GillCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Property -Servitudes
Opinion Number:2011 WY 25
Citation:248 P.3d 614 (Wyo. 2011)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/26/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/26/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/26/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/26/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/13/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellants'EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/30/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appelleesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/30/2010Event - Hardcopy received - certificate of service of the appellees' briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/30/2010Brief - AppelleesBriefAppelleeFinal
08/30/2010Service - Certificate of serviceServiceCertificate of serviceFinal
08/31/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for Appellees Lynn Babbitt, et al.Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
09/14/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/17/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
09/20/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/20/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kate Fox for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/21/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/23/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Daniel B. Frank for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/29/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/29/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/21/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Daniel Barry Frank for appellants; Amanda Kay Ferguson, William Hiser and Catherine M. Fox, argument by Ms. Fox for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/21/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/17/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/07/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/07/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/07/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/07/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/09/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 03/08/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal