judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DEVON M. SCOTT V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0480
Short Caption:DEVON M. SCOTT V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-3116-09Filed Date:04/19/2011

Opening Event Date:04/19/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/31/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/15/2011
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/21/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Erik KenersonYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/19/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/29/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Tonya L. Fleming, Esquire, it ishereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
04/29/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Tonya L. Fleming, Esquire
05/27/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
05/27/2011RECEIVED- aplt's motion for appeal transcript
08/02/2011FiledRecord Copies
08/02/2011FiledRecord Index
08/02/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #1 (SEALED pleadings)
08/05/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #1 (36 pgs/tape) 3/16/09 proc
08/05/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #2 (18 pgs/tape) 11/13/09 proc
08/05/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #3 (13 pgs/tape) 12/10/09 proc.
08/05/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #4 (9 pgs/tape) 5/17/10 proc.
08/05/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #5 (120 pgs/Kaczorowski) 2/1/11 proc.
08/05/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #6 (327 pgs/Kaczowski) 2/1-3/11 proc
08/05/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #7 (129 pgs/Van Bremen) 2/7/11 proc.
08/05/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #8 (58 pgs/Van Bremen) 2/8/11 proc.
08/05/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #9 (12 pgs/Van Bremen) 2/9/11 proc.
08/05/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #10 (20 pgs/tape) 4/13/11 proc.
08/05/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #11 (4 pgs/tape) 4/14/11 proc. w/cd
08/31/2011FiledRecord Completed
09/01/2011FiledBriefing Order
10/11/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
10/11/2011FiledAppendix (attached to Appellant's Brief) (Appellant)
11/03/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
11/15/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief to 12/15/11.
12/15/2011FiledBrief w/cd (exhibit A) (Appellee)
12/15/2011FiledBriefing Completed
01/31/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
03/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
04/12/2012FiledLetter re pending 23-110 motion in Superior Court & an error in appellee brief. (Appellee)
04/17/2012FiledMotion To Stay Appeal (Appellant)Granted
04/18/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to stay.
07/05/2012FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant)Granted
07/30/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to dismiss appeal.
07/30/2012FiledDismissed
08/21/2012FiledMandate
10/22/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)