judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BLAKE BRYAN LEAVITT v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0116)
Case Number:S-10-0116Case Docketed On:05/20/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Lincoln CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Public Administration 6-5-101 - 6-5-307
Short Title:BLAKE BRYAN LEAVITT v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:BLAKE BRYAN LEAVITT, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBlake Bryan LeavittDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jessica Y. Frint
Matthew E. Riehl

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2011 WY 11
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/20/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/20/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/20/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/07/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/08/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/17/2010Notice-Incoming - Consent and ApprovalNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
08/17/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/18/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Designation of Record on Appeal and Consent and ApprovalEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/27/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
09/07/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/10/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
09/20/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, six volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volumes III-V, Transcripts; Volume VI, Confidential Folder (PSI).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/20/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/05/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
01/24/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/09/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/09/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/09/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/09/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/14/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/11/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal