judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CERVANTES (LUIS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33608
Short Caption:CERVANTES (LUIS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR982233Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/13/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/13/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-00245
01/19/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: Uncertified Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings dated November 8, 1998. Court Reporter: Constance S. Eisenberg. Mailed on: 1/15/99. 99-00377
02/09/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-00894
02/09/1999AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 99-00896
02/19/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-01151
10/03/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's arguments and concluded that they are without merit, " . . . we affirm the judgment of the district court." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-17424
10/31/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-17521
10/31/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 2, 2000. 00-17521