judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMAL S. GILLESPIE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0525
Short Caption:JAMAL S. GILLESPIE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD24215-10Filed Date:04/27/2011

Opening Event Date:04/27/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/24/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/21/2014
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJamal S. Gilespie Y
T. Gail Maddox-LevineNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/27/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/11/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that T. Gail Maddox-Levine, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
05/11/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) T. Gail Maddox-Levine, Esquire
05/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (5pgs/Tape) 3/28/11 proc. (Morning)
05/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (64pgs/Tape) 3/28/11 proc. w/CD (Afternoon)
05/24/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/21/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT (unopposed)
06/21/2011RECEIVED - Statement Regarding Transcript (apart and attached to MOLV)
06/24/2011ORD GR MOT FOR LV TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCIPT and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: JAC)
06/24/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
08/01/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #3 (5pgs/Tape) 3/28/11 proc. w/CD
08/01/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File - until September 3, 2011 Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
08/11/2011FiledRecord Index
08/11/2011FiledRecord Copies
08/24/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief until September 6, 2011
09/05/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
09/05/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
10/11/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)Granted
10/13/2011FiledTMC/MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE/OPPO
10/17/2011FiledOpposition - to aple's motion for summary affirmance (Appellant)
01/30/2012FiledORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
01/30/2012FiledAffirmed
02/06/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Petition for Rehearing until March 13, 2012 (Appellant)
02/10/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET to file appellant's petition for rehearing on or before March 13, 2012.
03/19/2014FiledOrdered that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith.
03/21/2014FiledMandate