judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SMITH'S FOOD & DRUG VS. WINIARSKI

Case Information: 36490
Short Caption:SMITH'S FOOD & DRUG VS. WINIARSKICourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36395 , 40126
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A378591Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/08/2000 / Lavelle, EleissaSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/12/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/28/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Barker Brown Busby Chrisman & Thomas--check no. 3109.
07/28/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-13111
08/01/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgments filed 5/12/00 and 6/13/00. Due Date: 10 days
08/08/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Eleissa Lavelle. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/10/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Judgment on Jury Verdict filed in district court on 5/12/00; Certified copy of Order filed in district court on 6/13/00; and Certified copy of Notices of Entry of Judgment filed in district court on 5/15/00 and 6/13/00. 00-13977
08/15/2000Notice/Outgoing Letter. Eleissa Lavelle.
01/26/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-01777
01/26/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
02/14/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-02920
02/14/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: May 2, 2000 through May 5, 2000; June 12, 2000; July 17, 2000 and July 31, 2000. To Court Reporter: Cathy Nelson. 01-02921
02/23/2001Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 01-03467
03/19/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 5/1/00-5/5/00 (one volume); 5/2/00; 5/3/00; 5/4/00; 5/5/00; 6/12/00; 7/17/00; 7/31/00; Court Reporters: Cathy Nelson and Debra Van Blaricom. 01-04841
05/22/2001Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 70 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-08531
06/15/2001MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Appellant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.'s Motion to Consolidate Appeal. Nos. 36395/36490. 01-10037
06/21/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Consolitate. Nos. 36395/36490. 01-10478
08/01/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 08/01/01. 01-12967
08/01/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. 01-12968
08/31/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 8/30/01. 01-14769
08/31/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 01-14770
10/03/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 10/1/01. 01-16640
10/04/2001MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Appellant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Portions of Respondent Ronald Winiarski's Appendix to Respondent's Answering Brief. 01-16699
10/12/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Strike Portions of Respondent's Appendix to Respondent's Answering Brief. 01-17235
11/07/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Denying Motion to Strike Portions of Respondent's Appendix to the Answering Brief. We deny the motion to strike; however, this court will disregard any documents improperly included in the appendix. fn1[We remind counsel that submitting noncomplying briefs or unnecessarily enlarging an appendix may result in our imposition of sanctions under NRAP 30(b) and (g).] 01-18584
03/12/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 02-04432
03/12/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP02-CY/DA/ML
05/14/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-08442
06/11/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-08548
06/11/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/22/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 15, 2002. 02-08548