judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

INGRAM (TRENT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36482
Short Caption:INGRAM (TRENT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 74403 , 74403-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C123327Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/09/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/25/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/25/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12839
07/31/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Order denying motion to vacate judgment entered on 7/10/00. Due Date: 10 days
08/10/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on July 10, 2000. 00-13950
09/05/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 00-15530
10/09/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. 00-17799
10/09/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/17/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. ". . . we affirm the order of the district court." fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-20180
12/13/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-20269
12/13/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/11/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 28, 2000. 00-20269