judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ALEXIS MAJORS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0157)
Case Number:S-10-0157Case Docketed On:07/20/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Washakie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:ALEXIS MAJORS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ALEXIS MAJORS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAlexis MajorsDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Justin A. Daraie

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Evidence
Opinion Number:2011 WY 63
Citation:252 P.3d 435 (Wyo. 2011)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/20/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/20/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/20/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/07/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/08/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/25/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/26/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/08/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Justin A. Daraie, Assistant Attorney General for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/15/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/17/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David E. Westling for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/19/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/19/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/08/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David E. Westling, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Justin Ashkhan Daraie, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/08/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/13/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/29/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/29/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/29/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/29/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/03/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/2/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal