judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RAUL A. ESPINAL V. ROSELIA ESPINAL

Case Information: 11-FM-0515
Short Caption:RAUL A. ESPINAL V. ROSELIA ESPINALClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CPO422-11Filed Date:04/22/2011

Opening Event Date:04/22/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/29/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/23/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRaul A. Espinal N
Dominic G. VorvNY
AppelleeRoselia Espinal NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/22/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/13/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on February 9, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC)
05/27/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) 3/25/11 (rt. needed)
07/22/2011FiledRecord Index
08/29/2011FiledSupplemental Record#1 (55-pgs/tape 2/16/11 proc.)
08/29/2011StruckSupplemental Record #2 (57-pgs/tape 2/18/11 proc.)
08/29/2011FiledSupplemental Record #3 (69-pgs/tape 2/24/11 proc.)
08/29/2011FiledSupplemental Record#4 (38-pgs/page 3/3/11 proc.)
08/29/2011FiledSupplemental Record #5 (11-pgs/tape 3/25/11 proc. w/cd)
08/29/2011FiledRecord Completed
09/01/2011FiledBriefing Order
10/26/2011FiledOrder directing motion, brief & appendix
11/30/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
11/30/2011FiledDismissed
12/23/2011FiledMandate