judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WALLACE (CHARLES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36481
Short Caption:WALLACE (CHARLES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 39721 , 41398
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C159862Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/25/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/25/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-12837
08/28/2000TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: May 1, 2, 3 & 4, 2000; June 12, 2000. Court Reporter: Sharleen Nicholson. 00-15064
09/25/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. To date, no fast track statement has been filed. Cousnel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 00-16863
10/10/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-17901
10/10/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-17902
10/19/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-18519
01/09/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's contention and concluded it is without merit, " . . . the judgment of conviction is affirmed." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-00424
02/06/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-00659
02/06/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/13/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 13, 2001. 01-00659