judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION v. ROBERT C. CARSON

Case Heading (S-10-0156)
Case Number:S-10-0156Case Docketed On:07/16/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION v. ROBERT C. CARSON
Full Title:STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellant (Respondent), v. ROBERT C. CARSON, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey
AppelleeRobert C. CarsonKatherine Lamere Mead

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2011 WY 61
Citation:252 P.3d 929

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/16/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/16/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/30/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/30/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant/Respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division; and copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/18/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/20/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Plaintiff Robert C. Carson; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/26/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
11/02/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
11/03/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant/Respondent Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/03/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/09/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
11/12/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes, (Volume I, Original Papers; Volumes II & III, Agency Record)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/14/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
04/12/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversed in part, Justice Burke writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/28/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/28/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/04/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/2/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal