judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES G. WALKER V. LINDA D. MONK, ET AL

Case Information: 11-CV-0514
Short Caption:JAMES G. WALKER V. LINDA D. MONK, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAR2861-08Filed Date:04/22/2011

Opening Event Date:04/22/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/07/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/07/2012
Argued/Submitted:11/06/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/11/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames G. Walker N
Leonard L. LongYY
AppelleeLinda D. MonkNPro SeN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY
Andrew Van Brisker NN
IntervenorBregasi, LLCN
Ashley E. WigginsYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/22/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/12/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on April 22, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
05/23/2011FiledSTATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 10/17/08, 6/30/09, 9/25/09, 10/9/09, 2/18/10 & 12/10/10) (elp)
07/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (6-pgs/tape 10/17/08 proc.)
07/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (7-pgs/tape 6/30/09 proc.)
07/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (11-pgs/tape 9/25/09 proc.)
07/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#4 (10-pgs/tape 10/9/09 proc.)
07/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#5 (9-pgs/tape 2/18/10 proc)
07/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#6 (13-pgs/tape 12/10/10 proc.)w/cd
07/07/2011RECORD INDEX
07/07/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/14/2011FiledBriefing Order
07/14/2011FiledAppearance by Leonard L. Long as Counsel for (Appellant)
08/02/2011FiledReceived ORDER dated 7/14/11, mailed to appellee Linda D. Monk at 1101 Glen Willow Drive, #12, Capitol Heights, MD 20743 and returned by the U.S. Postal Office as "undeliverable" and forward to files this date. elp (Appellee Monk)
08/11/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until September 22, 2011 (Appellant)Granted
08/30/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Appendix, Brief until September 22, 2011 (Appellant)
09/26/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File (Appellant)Granted
09/27/2011FiledReceived Order dated 8/30/11, mailed to appellee Linda D. Monk at 1101 Glen Willow Drive, #12, Capitol Heights, MD 20743, and returned by the U.S. Postal Office as "undeliverable" and remailed to the following alternative address 7429 Calder Drive, #12, Capitol Heights, MD 20743, as it appears on the certificate of service page of appellant's motion for leave filed on 9/26/11 (Appellee Monk)
09/28/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File the lodged brief and the appendix (Appellant) and directing appellee's brief within 30 days
09/28/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
09/28/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
10/13/2011FiledReceived Returned Mail for the Order dated 9/28/11, mailed to appellee Linda Monk at 1101 Glen Willow Drive #12, Capitol Heights, MD 20743, and returned by the U.S. Postal Office and "undeliverable" and remailed to appellee (Linda Monk) at the following alternative address: 7429 Calder Drive, #12, Capitol Heights, MD 20743. BE due 30 days from today 11/14/11. elp
10/19/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee District of Columbia)Granted
11/22/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee District of Columbia)
11/22/2011FiledOrder directing appellee Linda D. Monk to file the brief accompanied by a motion for leave within 15 days from the date of the order
11/30/2011FiledReceived ORDER dated 9/28/11, mailed to appellee Linda D. Monk at 7429 Calder Drive #12, Capitol Heights, MD 20743, and returned this date by the U.S. Postal Office as "undeliverable and filed this date. (Appellee Monk)
12/08/2011FiledReceived ORDER dated 11/22/11, mailed to appellee Linda D. Monk at 7429 Calder Driver, Capitol Heights, MD 20743 and returned by the U.S. Postal Office as "undeliverable" and forwarded to files this date. (Appellee Monk)
12/22/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee District of Columbia)Granted
01/05/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee District of Columbia)
01/06/2012FiledReceived Order dated 11/22/11, mailed to appellee Linda Monk at 7429 Calder Drive, Capitol Heights, MD 20743, returned by the U.S. Postal Office and filed this date. (Appellee Monk)
01/23/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee District of Columbia)Granted
01/26/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee District of Columbia)
02/14/2012FiledBrief (Appellee Monk)
02/16/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee District of Columbia)Granted
02/23/2012FiledOpposition to appellee District of Columbia's motion for extension of time to file brief (Appellant)
02/24/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File motion for leave to file brief of an amicus curiae or, in the alternative, motion to intervene Brief (Amicus Curiae)Granted
03/20/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee District of Columbia)
03/20/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File motion for leave to file brief of an amicus curiae or, in the alternative, motion to intervene Brief (Amicus Curiae)
03/21/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief to May 21, 2012. Brief (Appellee District of Columbia)Granted
04/10/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief to May 21, 2012. Brief (Appellee District of Columbia)
04/18/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Intervenor)Granted
05/01/2012FiledMemorandum/Statement In Lieu Of Brief (Appellee District of Columbia)
05/07/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Intervenor)
05/07/2012FiledBrief (Intervenor)
05/07/2012FiledAppendix (Intervenor)
05/07/2012FiledBriefing Completed
06/25/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
07/03/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
10/02/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/06/2012FiledArgued Before Judges Oberly,Mcleese,Pryor, Leonard L. Long Esq.,for appellant James G. Walker, Linda D. Monk Pro Se for Appellee, Ashley E. Wiggins Esq.,for appellee Bregasi LLC.
12/20/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Oberly and McLeese, Associate Judge, and Pryor, Senior Judge.)
01/11/2013FiledMandate