judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROGER COLUMBUS SCOTT V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0503
Short Caption:ROGER COLUMBUS SCOTT V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Sexual Solicitation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD830-10Filed Date:04/21/2011

Opening Event Date:04/21/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/07/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/13/2012
Argued/Submitted:06/21/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/31/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRoger Columbus Scott YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Margaret E. BarrYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/21/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/11/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Matthew Leefer, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
05/11/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Matthew Leefer, Esquire
05/17/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
07/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (163 pgs/Wycoff) 4/8/11 proc.
07/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (299 pgs/Wycoff) 4/11/11 proc.
07/07/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/13/2011FiledBriefing Order
07/26/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #3 (order Judge Lopez filed 2/22/11) ****** (SEALED)
07/26/2011FiledRecord Index
07/26/2011FiledRecord Copies
08/22/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
08/31/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix utnil November 30, 2011
11/29/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/14/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until January 30, 2012
01/30/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
01/30/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
02/07/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
02/23/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief on or before March 13, 2012
03/13/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
03/13/2012FiledBriefing Completed
03/29/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
05/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
06/21/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Nebeker, Thompson, Washington
06/21/2012FiledSubmitted To Judges Blackburne-Rigsby,Oberly,Beckwith
07/06/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Thompson, Associate Judge, and Nebeker, Senior Judge.)
07/31/2012FiledMandate
08/07/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)