judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CANYON GATE AT LV VS. CANYON GATE MASTER ASSN

Case Information: 33622
Short Caption:CANYON GATE AT LV VS. CANYON GATE MASTER ASSNCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A379360Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/29/1999 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/19/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from William E. Cooper Law Office--check no. 2060.
01/19/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00338
01/28/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
02/01/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (Mailed on: 1/28/99). 99-00678
06/25/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-05590
06/25/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 99-05591
07/07/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is hereby dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 99-05988
07/07/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.