judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GARY COLLINS SCOTT v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0139)
Case Number:S-10-0139Case Docketed On:06/25/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:GARY COLLINS SCOTT v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:GARY COLLINS SCOTT, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGary Collins ScottDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Paul S. Rehurek

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2011 WY 56
Citation:248 P.3d 1162

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/25/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/25/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/06/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/06/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/09/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/22/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/03/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/12/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
11/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/24/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
12/01/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/14/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
03/30/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/15/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/15/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/15/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/15/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/19/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/18/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal