judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TURNER (JACQUELINE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33628
Short Caption:TURNER (JACQUELINE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C153611Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/19/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/19/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-00345
01/28/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Christy L. Craig-Rohan shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. 99-00601
02/22/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Arraignment--10/8/98; Sentencing--12/7/98. Court Reporter: Tina B. Smith. 99-01189
03/10/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-01674
03/10/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-01675
03/30/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-02357
05/13/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99A-CY/MS/ML 99-03894
06/08/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-04843
06/08/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/01/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 29, 1999. 99-04843