judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

JOE W. BURKETT, JR. v. SUPERIOR REALTY AND CONSTRUCTION CO.

Case: B-4300
B-4300
11/15/1973
Application for Writ of Error
JOE W. BURKETT, JR.
SUPERIOR REALTY AND CONSTRUCTION CO.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/05/1974Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/28/1973Brief on the MeritsRespondent
11/19/1973Amended PetitionPetitioner
11/15/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/05/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/05/1973Response to Motion filed
11/28/1973Brief on the Merits
11/26/1973Motion to dismissOverruled
11/19/1973Amended Petition
11/19/1973Miscellaneous Motion
11/15/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/15/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Joe W. Burkett, Jr.Petitioner
Superior Realty and Construction Co.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information