judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SCHARE VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 36472
Short Caption:SCHARE VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37297
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9903170Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/24/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Robison Belaustegui Sharp & Low--check no. 48497.
07/24/2000Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition. 00-12791
07/24/2000Petition/WritFiled Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Writ. 00-12792
07/24/2000MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Emergency Motion for Stay of Proceedings. 00-12794
07/25/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to attorney Kent Robison requesting that page 5 of Exhibit 3 be faxed to this office. (Missing from original petition.) 00-12894
07/26/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. via fax from attorney Kent Robison, enclosing page 5 to Exhibit 3. 00-12925
07/26/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Kent Robison, enclosing page 5 to Exhibit 3. (Original) 00-12974
07/28/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. " . . . we deny the petition." fn1[In light of this order, we deny as moot petitioners' motion for a stay. We note that by answering the complaint, petitioners will not waive their jurisdictional defense.] NSP99B-RR/WM/MS 00-13092
08/23/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-13654
08/23/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.