judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RODNEY LIVINGSTON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0624
Short Caption:RODNEY LIVINGSTON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD19592-10Filed Date:05/20/2011

Opening Event Date:05/20/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/27/2012
Argued/Submitted:05/24/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/16/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRodney Livingston Y
Vicki C. BryantYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
John TruongYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/20/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/13/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Vickie Bryant, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
06/13/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Vickie Bryant, Esquire
07/01/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
10/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #1 (9pgs/Tape) 10/18/10 proc.
10/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #2 (7pgs/Tape) 11/8/10 proc.
10/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #3 (12pgs/Tape) 12/20/10 proc.
10/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #4 (8pgs/Tape) 1/11/11 proc.
10/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #5 (6pgs/Tape) 2/2/11 proc.
10/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #6 (90 pgs/Henderson) 4/26/11 proc.
10/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #7 (97pgs/Van Bremen) 5/12/11 proc.
10/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #8 (119pgs/Van Bremen) 5/13/11 proc.
10/03/2011FiledRecord Completed
10/05/2011FiledBriefing Order
10/06/2011FiledRecord Copies
10/06/2011FiledRecord Index
11/09/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - until December 5, 2011 (Appellant)Granted
11/16/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until December 5, 2011
12/05/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
12/05/2011FiledAppendix (attached to Appellant's Brief) (Appellant)
01/05/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief - until January 23, 2012 (Appellee)Granted
01/27/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and the lodged brief of appellee is filed
01/27/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
01/27/2012FiledBriefing Completed
02/15/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
03/29/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
05/24/2012FiledSubmitted to Fisher, Steadman, Beckwith
06/22/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
07/16/2012FiledMandate