Case: 01-83-00382-CR
01-83-00382-CR
06/08/1983
Rape
Benitez, Israel Amaya
Texas, The State of
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/20/1985 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
04/24/1985 | No description available. | Refused | |
10/01/1984 | No description available. | | |
08/16/1984 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
06/28/1984 | Submitted | | |
05/29/1984 | Brief filed | | |
05/10/1984 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
04/27/1984 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
04/27/1984 | Submission | | |
03/28/1984 | Brief filed | | |
03/08/1984 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
02/27/1984 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
02/09/1984 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
01/05/1984 | Record filed | | |
06/11/1983 | Case file returned from higher Court or agency. | | |
06/08/1983 | Notice of appeal filed | | |
01/27/1983 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/20/1985 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State | Criminal - Appellant | |
State | Criminal - State of Texas | |
State | Criminal - Appellant | |
State | Criminal - State of Texas |
Trial Court Information
248th District Court
Harris
374251
40 yrs TDC