judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6600
A-6600
12/12/1957
Application for Writ of Error
LECUNO OIL COMPANY
T. P. SMITH, JR., ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/18/1958Reply to ResponsePetitioner
01/30/1958Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/26/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
12/12/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/18/1958Reply to Response
02/10/1958Response to Motion filed
01/30/1958Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/26/1957Response to Petition
12/12/1957Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/12/1957Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
T. P. Smith, Jr., et al.Respondent
LeCuno Oil CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information