judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BERRY (ERIC) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 34645
Short Caption:BERRY (ERIC) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR96P2376Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/10/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/10/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-07342
08/12/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 20, 1999. Court Reporter: Cindy Lee Brown. 99-07486
08/18/1999Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on August 13, 1999, appointing Karla K. Butko as counsel for appellant. 99-07711
08/27/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Transmission of Trial Exhibits. 99-08028
08/27/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-08029
08/27/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-08030
09/09/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-08504
09/14/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of the district court is directed to forward Exhibit A to this court for filing and consideration with the appendix. 99-08673
09/21/1999ExhibitFiled Exhibits (copies). State's Exhibit A. 99-08999
10/28/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 99-10582
11/23/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned State's Exhibit A. 99-11721
11/23/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/08/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 3, 1999. 99-11721