judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CLEO COOPER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0018)
Parent: S-07-0049 Case Docketed On:01/24/2007
Consolidated:S-07-0018
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:CLEO COOPER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CLEO COOPER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCleo CooperDiane M. Lozano
Ryan R. Roden
Tina N. Olson
Donna D. Domonkos
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 5
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/24/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/24/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/24/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/08/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/09/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/17/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/17/2007Motion - ConsolidateMotionConsolidateFinal
04/18/2007Order - Consolidating casesOrderConsolidating casesFinal
04/18/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/25/2007Response/Objection - Motion to consolidate, pro seResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
05/08/2007Order - Other - overruling Appellant's objection to consolidation of appealsOrderOtherFinal
06/04/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
07/16/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
07/20/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/03/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/06/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/09/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from the District Court Clerk, seven volumes total. S-07-0049 Volumes I & II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Confidential Information; S-07-0018 Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential InformationRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/09/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
01/18/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/05/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/05/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/05/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/05/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal