- 2277CV00149 Forever Endeavor, LLC vs. Board of Appeals of Andover et al
- Case Type:
- Real Property
- Case Status:
- Open
- File Date
- 02/16/2022
- DCM Track:
- F - Fast Track
- Initiating Action:
- Zoning Appeal, G.L. c. 40A
- Status Date:
- 02/16/2022
- Case Judge:
- Next Event:
Party Information
Forever Endeavor, LLC - Plaintiff
Alias
Party Attorney
- Attorney
- Caruso, Esq., Peter J
- Bar Code
- 076920
- Address
- Caruso and Caruso, LLP68 Main StAndover, MA 01810
- Phone Number
- (978)475-2200
More Party Information
Board of Appeals of Andover - Defendant
Alias
Party Attorney
- Attorney
- Urbelis, Esq., Thomas J
- Bar Code
- 506560
- Address
- 6 Eastman RdAndover, MA 01810
- Phone Number
- (508)523-4652
More Party Information
Oltman, Elizabeth - Defendant
Alias
Party Attorney
- Attorney
- Urbelis, Esq., Thomas J
- Bar Code
- 506560
- Address
- 6 Eastman RdAndover, MA 01810
- Phone Number
- (508)523-4652
More Party Information
Faulk, Kathy - Defendant
Alias
Party Attorney
- Attorney
- Urbelis, Esq., Thomas J
- Bar Code
- 506560
- Address
- 6 Eastman RdAndover, MA 01810
- Phone Number
- (508)523-4652
More Party Information
Keller, Ellen - Defendant
Alias
Party Attorney
- Attorney
- Urbelis, Esq., Thomas J
- Bar Code
- 506560
- Address
- 6 Eastman RdAndover, MA 01810
- Phone Number
- (508)523-4652
More Party Information
Novaria, Michael - Defendant
Alias
Party Attorney
- Attorney
- Urbelis, Esq., Thomas J
- Bar Code
- 506560
- Address
- 6 Eastman RdAndover, MA 01810
- Phone Number
- (508)523-4652
More Party Information
Lopez, Daniel - Defendant
Alias
Party Attorney
- Attorney
- Urbelis, Esq., Thomas J
- Bar Code
- 506560
- Address
- 6 Eastman RdAndover, MA 01810
- Phone Number
- (508)523-4652
More Party Information
Ticklers
Service | 02/16/2022 | 05/17/2022 | 90 | |
Answer | 02/16/2022 | 06/16/2022 | 120 | |
Rule 12/19/20 Served By | 02/16/2022 | 06/16/2022 | 120 | |
Rule 12/19/20 Filed By | 02/16/2022 | 07/18/2022 | 152 | |
Rule 12/19/20 Heard By | 02/16/2022 | 08/15/2022 | 180 | |
Rule 15 Served By | 02/16/2022 | 06/16/2022 | 120 | |
Rule 15 Filed By | 02/16/2022 | 07/18/2022 | 152 | |
Rule 15 Heard By | 02/16/2022 | 08/15/2022 | 180 | |
Discovery | 02/16/2022 | 12/13/2022 | 300 | |
Rule 56 Served By | 02/16/2022 | 01/12/2023 | 330 | |
Rule 56 Filed By | 02/16/2022 | 02/13/2023 | 362 | |
Final Pre-Trial Conference | 02/16/2022 | 06/12/2023 | 481 | |
Judgment | 02/16/2022 | 02/16/2024 | 730 |
Docket Information
02/16/2022 | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 02/16/2022 | Image | |
02/16/2022 | Original civil complaint filed. | 1 | Image |
02/16/2022 | Civil action cover sheet filed. | 2 | Image |
03/03/2022 | Affidavit of Service in Compliance with GL c.40A s.17 Returned for Defendant Board of Appeals of Andover and its members: Service through person in charge / agent and via certified mail | 3 | Image |
Case Disposition
Pending |