Case Information: 81-CF-1298 | |||
Short Caption: | BROWN, ANTHONY UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F4079-80 | Filed Date: | 10/01/1981 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 10/01/1981 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 05/24/1982 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 11/01/1982 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 01/13/1983 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | BROWN, ANTHONY UNITED STATES | |||
10/01/1981 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
05/24/1982 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
11/01/1982 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
01/13/1983 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
02/04/1983 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |