Case Information: 33685 | |||
Short Caption: | WALLIS VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR962204 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/29/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/29/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-00649 | |
03/01/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1-We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted. SNP99A-WM/DA/NB | 99-01356 | |
03/29/1999 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 99-02257 | |
03/29/1999 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/06/1999 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 31, 1999. | 99-02257 |