judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MOCK, THOMAS R. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-1246
Short Caption:MOCK, THOMAS R. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2830-80Filed Date:09/23/1981

Opening Event Date:09/23/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/23/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/21/1983
Argued/Submitted:06/09/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MOCK, THOMAS R. UNITED STATES
09/23/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/23/1982FiledRecord Completed
03/21/1983FiledBriefing Completed
06/09/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/30/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition