Case: 14-98-00817-CV
14-98-00817-CV
07/22/1998
Contract
Chapman, Pat Sr.
Hootman, Timothy
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/16/2014 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
08/11/2014 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
10/25/1999 | Case stored | | |
10/14/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |
10/14/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |
10/07/1999 | Mandate due to be issued | | |
09/13/1999 | No Pettition for Review FILED | | |
09/13/1999 | Petition for Review DUE | | |
08/13/1999 | Motion for rehearing DUE | | |
08/13/1999 | No motion for rehearing FILED | | |
07/29/1999 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
07/29/1999 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
07/28/1999 | Submitted | | |
07/28/1999 | Submission | | |
07/28/1999 | Submitted | | |
02/04/1999 | Motion to Expedite Appeal DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | DENIED | |
01/25/1999 | Fee of $10 is now due on civil motions FILED. | | |
01/22/1999 | Motion to Expedite Appeal FILED-ANT,APE,APP | | |
11/09/1998 | Appellee's brief DUE | | |
10/21/1998 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
10/08/1998 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
10/08/1998 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
10/08/1998 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/08/1998 | Case ready to be set | | |
09/01/1998 | Fee now due on all responses in civil cases filed. | | |
08/27/1998 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
08/26/1998 | Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA | | |
08/24/1998 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
08/21/1998 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
08/19/1998 | Record due | | |
07/27/1998 | Mediation Docketing Statement FILED | | |
07/24/1998 | No reporter's record DUE to be filed | | |
07/23/1998 | Clerk's record FILED - APP,STA | | |
07/22/1998 | Clerk's copy of NOA FILED | | |
07/22/1998 | Notice for Docketing Statement FILED | | |
07/22/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
07/20/1998 | Docketing Statement FILED | | |
07/01/1998 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | | |
05/20/1998 | Motion for new trial FILED | | |
04/21/1998 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/16/2014 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
CHAPMAN, PAT SR. | Appellant | Lana R. Dieringer |
HOOTMAN, TIMOTHY | Appellee | Dale W. Felton Timothy A. Hootman |
Trial Court Information
Co Civil Ct at Law No 2
Harris
Honorable TOM SULLIVAN
690,696