Case Heading (S-13-0043) | |||||
Case Number: | S-13-0043 | Case Docketed On: | 03/15/2013 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Third Judicial District Sweetwater County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1) | ||
Short Title: | JEFF KORDUS and SUZETTE KORDUS, Parents and next friend to JK, a minor child v. LEIGH A. MONTES, M.D. | ||||
Full Title: | JEFF KORDUS and SUZETTE KORDUS, Parents and next friend to JK, a minor child, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. LEIGH A. MONTES, M.D., Appellee (Defendant). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Jeff Kordus | David B. Hooper Robert Allen Bundy |
Appellant | Suzette Kordus | David B. Hooper Robert Allen Bundy |
Appellee | Leigh A. Montes M.D. | W. Henry Combs III Meggan J. Nicholas |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Constitutional Law - Wyoming, Limitation of Actions |
Opinion Number: | 2014 WY 146 |
Citation: | 337 P.3d 1138 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
03/15/2013 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
03/15/2013 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
03/15/2013 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
03/15/2013 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
03/15/2013 | Notice-Outgoing - Other - Notice to counsel regarding mandatory e-filing and service of orders sent to Robert Bundy. | Notice-Outgoing | Other | Final | |
04/03/2013 | Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance, Meggan J. Hathaway obo Appellee | Notice-Incoming | Entry of appearance | Final | |
04/03/2013 | Event - Hardcopy received - Entry of Appearance | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
04/25/2013 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
04/25/2013 | Response/Objection - Extension | Response/Objection | Extension | Final | |
04/25/2013 | Event - Hardcopy received - Response to Appellants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
04/29/2013 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
04/29/2013 | Order - Grant - extension of time (Due date shortened to June 17, 2013) | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
06/17/2013 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
06/18/2013 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
08/01/2013 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
08/02/2013 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
08/20/2013 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
08/28/2013 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
08/30/2013 | Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record transmittal notice from district court | Final | |
08/30/2013 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript; Volume III, Redaction Folder. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
09/10/2013 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Meggan J. Hathaway obo Appellee | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
09/23/2013 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Robert A. Bundy obo Appellants | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
10/09/2013 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justices Hill, Voigt, Burke, and Davis (Robert A. Bundy appearing on behalf of Appellants; W. Henry Combs, III, Meggan J. Hathaway, argument by Ms. Hathaway on behalf of Appellee) and taken under advisement. | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
11/14/2014 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Chief Justice Burke writing for the court. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
12/02/2014 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
12/02/2014 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
12/02/2014 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
12/02/2014 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
12/08/2014 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - record received 12/4/14 | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |