Case Information: 81-CF-1437 | |||
Short Caption: | ALBERT F. SMITH V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F6388-80 | Filed Date: | 10/19/1981 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 10/19/1981 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 07/30/1982 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 04/28/1983 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 07/05/1983 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Albert F. Smith | N |
| |||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | SMITH, ALBERT F. UNITED STATES | |||
10/19/1981 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
07/30/1982 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
04/28/1983 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
07/05/1983 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
12/15/1983 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |