judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAVID KISSI V. MILTON MORRIS

Case Information: 11-CV-0195
Short Caption:DAVID KISSI V. MILTON MORRISClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead: 10-CV-0673 Consolidated: 10-CV-1334 , 11-CV-0195
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB3992-08Filed Date:02/11/2011

Opening Event Date:02/11/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/04/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/24/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDavid KissiNPro SeN
AppelleeMilton Morris N
Ellen B. Flynn NN
M. Celeste BruceNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/11/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/22/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 10/14/10, 7/23/10, 1/13/10, 8/7/09, 4/28/09 & 9/26/08) (elp)
02/25/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular
03/01/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on February 11, 2011, and the statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and transcripts in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
03/31/2011 On consideration of appellants' motion to consolidate appeals and to combine reply brief in appeals nos. 10-CV-673 & 10-CV-1334 and the opening brief in appeal no. 11-CV-195, and the response thereto, and it appearing that transcript is needed for appeal no. 11-CV-195, it is ORDERED that appellants' motion to consolidate is granted and appeal no. 11-CV-195 is consolidated without previously consolidated appeals nos. 10-CV-673 & 10-CV-1334 for all purposes. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellants' motion to combine reply brief and opening brief in 11-CV-195 is granted to the extent that, in appeal no. 11-CV-195, a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and transcripts as required by D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (ETW) elp
07/26/2011FiledRecord Index (11cv195)
08/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record #2 (9-pg/tape 9/26/08 proc.)
08/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record #3 (31-pgs/tape 4/28/09 proc.
08/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record #4 (17-pgs/tape 8/7/09proc.)
08/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record #5 (44-pgs/johnson 1/13/10 proc.)
08/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record#6(25-pgst/tape 10/14/10 proc.)
08/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record #7 (37-pgs/tape 7/23/10 proc.)w/cd
08/04/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/08/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/19/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief in 10-CV-673 & 10-CV-1334 to October 19, 2011. Appendix, Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
09/19/2011FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw as counsel in these consolidated appeals. (Appellant)Granted
09/22/2011FiledOpposition to aplt's attorney motion to withdraw (Appellant)
09/28/2011FiledOpposition to aplt's motion for extension of time and to withdraw as counsel and aple's motion motion to dismiss consolidated appeals (Appellee)
10/03/2011FiledReply of Appellant's Counsel to opposition to motion to withdraw (Atty Francis)
10/05/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File second oppo to E.P. Francis motion (Appellant) filed by (David Kiss, aplt)Granted
10/11/2011FiledOpposition to Appellee's Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Appeals (Appellant)
10/11/2011FiledReply of Appellants to Appellee's Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Brief (Appellant)
10/19/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief in 10-CV-673 & -1334 and the opening brief in 11-CV-195 by 21 days after the Court rules on the motion to withdraw. (Appellant)Granted
11/22/2011FiledOrder Granting Counsel's Motion To Withdraw as counsel in these consolidated appeals. (Appellant)
11/22/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File second oppo to E.P. Francis motion (Appellant) filed by (David Kiss, aplt)
11/22/2011FiledOpposition 2nd oppo to attorney's motion to withdraw (filed by: David Kiss, aplt) (Appellant)
11/22/2011FiledReply to Appellee's Opposition to Motion of Appellant's Counsel to Withdraw as Counsel (Appellant)
11/22/2011FiledOrder directing appellant Yakima Supplies, Inc. in appeals nos. 10-CV-673 and 10-CV-1334 to provide this court with the identity of its new counsel within 15 days from the date of the order.
11/22/2011FiledOrder directing appellant David Kissi in appeal no. 11-CV-195 to provide this court with the identity of his new counsel within 15 days from the date of this order
11/22/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief in 10-CV-673 & -1334 and the opening brief in 11-CV-195 by 21 days after the Court rules on the motion to withdraw. (Appellant) Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief in 10-CV-673 & 10-CV-1334 to October 19, 2011. Appendix, Reply Brief (Appellant)
11/22/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte holding Appellee's Motion to Dismiss in Abeyance pending further Order of this court
12/05/2011FiledMotion To Reconsider - of order of 11/22/11 (filed by Kissi) (Appellant)Denied
12/14/2011FiledMotion to stay withdrawal of Atty Ernest P. Francis as Petitioner's Counsel. (Appellant)Denied
12/22/2011FiledOrder Denying Motion to Reconsider order of 11/22/11
12/22/2011FiledOrder Denying Motion to stay withdrawal of Atty Ernest P. Francis as Petitioner's Counsel.
12/22/2011FiledOrder directing appellant Yakima Suipplies to identify counsel within 15 days and to file appellants' reply brief in 10-CV-673 and 10-CV-1334 and appellants' opening brief in 11-CV-195 on or before January 19, 2012.
01/20/2012FiledMotion from aplt against this court's order releasing aplt's attorney E.P. Francis (Appellant)Denied
02/01/2012FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellee)Granted
02/13/2012FiledOpposition to appellee's counsel Ellen B. Flynn's motion to withdrawal (Appellant) David Kissi
02/29/2012FiledOrder Denying Motion from aplt against this court's order releasing aplt's attorney E.P. Francis (Appellant)
02/29/2012FiledOrder Granting Counsel's Motion to Withdraw (Appellee)
03/12/2012FiledMotion for reconsideration of Court's order dated February 29, 2012 (Appellant)Denied
04/05/2012FiledOrder Denying Motion for reconsideration of Court's order dated February 29, 2012 (Appellant)
05/02/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeals and DENYING Appellee's Motion to Dismiss as MOOT
05/02/2012FiledDismissed
05/24/2012FiledMandate