judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IRWIN, JR (WILLIAM) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34937
Short Caption:IRWIN, JR (WILLIAM) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 45420 , 46713 , 49282
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CR3264Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/07/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/07/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-09701
10/14/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 7, 1999, September 28, 1999. Court Reporter: Jeanie Wright. 99-09961
11/05/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-10915
11/05/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-10917
11/29/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-11838
11/29/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 99-11840
12/16/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief and appendix due: 40 days. fn[We suspend the requirement in NRAP9 for counsel to file a certified transcript.] Answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. 99-12739
02/02/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-01686
02/25/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-02996
02/28/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The opening brief provisionally submitted on February 25, 2000, shall be filed, forthwith. 00-03079
02/28/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 02/23/00. 00-02997
03/29/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 3/27/00. 00-05040
03/29/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-05041
05/03/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 5/1/00. 00-07200
09/08/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-15818
09/27/2000Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Mailed on: 9/25/00--LV Drop Box. 00-17048
12/26/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-22392
01/10/2001Other Returned Unfiled Document. Petition for Rehearing En Banc.
01/11/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-22567
01/11/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/27/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 19, 2001. 00-22567