judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STONE (MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34938
Short Caption:STONE (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34993 , 38396
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR990743Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/07/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/07/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09703
10/15/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. July 30, 1999 and September 30, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Judith Ann Schonlau. 99-10020
10/25/1999Other Other. Changed from Fast Track/Direct to Proper Person/Direct.
01/04/2000Order/CounselFiled Order/Remand for Designation of Counsel. District court clerk shall file order of appointment in this court, serve counsel with this order, and submit proof of service to this court, OR file order of non-indigency in this court within 30 days. Counsel shall have10 days to enter an appearance with the clerk of this court. fn1[All filing deadlines shall commence to run from the date on which counsel is required, under this order, to enter an appearance in this court]. fn2[On November 4, 1999, this court received appellant's motion for leave to proceed jointly on appeal with Dwight Anthony Monroe. We deny appellant's motion to proceed jointly on appeal. This appeal shall proceed as outlined above]. 00-00098
01/10/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Order filed in the district court on January 6, 2000, appointing Karla Butko as counsel for appellant. 00-00403
01/11/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on 1/6/00 appointing Karla Butko as counsel for appellant. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel). 00-00442
01/26/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-01285
02/04/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Allow Appellant to Represent Himself on Direct Appeal. (Filed by Karla Butko, counsel for appellant) 00-01814
03/10/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On January 27, 2000, appellant submitted a proper person motion seeking leave to proceed in proper person. On February 4, 2000, appellant's counsel filed a motion to allow appellat to represent himself on direct appeal. We direct the clerk to file the january 27, 2000, proper person submission. Nonetheless, we note that appellant has no right to proceed in proper person on appeal and we deny the pending motions. Appellant is represented by appointed counsel and should direct all requests for relief directly to counsel. fn1[The clerk shall return, unfiled, the proper perosn submissions of February 8, 2000, and February 11, 2000.] 00-03821
03/10/2000MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for Leave to File in Proper Person. 00-01366
03/10/2000Notice/IncomingReceived Proper Person Notice. 03/10/00 order: returned original proper person Notice unfiled. 00-01997
03/10/2000Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. 03/10/00 order: returned original proper person Document unfiled. 00-01998
03/10/2000Notice/IncomingReceived Proper Person Notice. 03/10/00 order: returned original proper person Notice unfiled. 00-01999
03/10/2000Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. 03/10/00 order: returned original proper person Document unfiled. 00-02184
03/10/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Returned unfiled with letter to appellant Stone: original proper person Notice of Filing; Filing of Notices; Notice of Removal received 02/08/00 and Waiver of Appointment of Counsel and motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal in Proper Person with Assistance of Counsel received 02/11/00.
09/08/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-15892
09/08/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Volumes 1 and 2. 00-15893
09/20/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-16942
10/18/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On January 6, 2000, the district court appointed Karla Butko to represent appellant in this appeal. On August 9, 2000, appellant submitted to this court a proper person motion for leave to file papers in proper person. We again note that appellant has no right to proceed in proper person on appeal, and we deny the motion. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, appellant's proper person motion submitted on August 9, 2000. Appellant should direct all future requests for relief directly to counsel. On September 8, 2000, counsel for appellant filed a fast track statement and fast track appendix. On September 20, 2000, respondent filed a fast track response. Because appellant proceeded in proper person in the court below, this is not a fast track appeal. Nevertheless, we elect to exercise our discretion and to apply NRAP 3C -- the Fast Track Rule -- to this appeal. Fast track briefing is deemed completed in this appeal. To date, appellant has not filed a transcript request form. Transcripts for proceedings held on July 30, 1999, and September 30, 1999, were filed in this court on October 15, 1999. Unless appellant informs this court otherwise in writing within 15 days from the date of this order, we will deem all transcripts necessary for the prosecution of this appeal to have been filed. 00-18432
10/18/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant Michael John Stone: returned unfiled, the original proper person Motion for Leave to File in Proper Person received on August 9, 2000.
10/23/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-18696
11/20/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's contentions and concluded that they lack merit or were waived by entry of the guilty plea, " . . . we affirm the judgment of conviction." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-20357
12/20/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We deny appellant's December 15, 2000 motions. Attorney Karla K. Butko shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to file a petition for rehearing, if any. If attorney Butko does not file a petition for rehearing within 15 days from the date of this order, the clerk of this court shall issue the remittitur 20 days from the date of this order. 00-22134
12/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On December 27, 2000, the clerk of this court received from appellant a proper person "Motion for Leave to File in Forma Pauperis" and a proper person "Petition for Rehearing." The motion and petition were signed on December 21, 2000, apparently before appellant received a copy of our order entered on December 20, 2000. fn1[This court has not granted appellant leave to file papers in proper person. We have received and considered appellant's motion and petition.] This court having granted appellant's counsel an extension of time to file a petition for rehearing on appellant's behalf, we deny appellant's motion and petition. The clerk shall return to appellant, unfiled, the motion and petition received on December 27, 2000. 00-22621
12/28/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant Michael John Stone: returned unfiled, the original proper person Motion for Leave to File in Forma Pauperis and Petition for Rehearing, received December 27, 2000.
01/16/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-00859
01/16/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/27/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 17, 2001. 01-00859
03/30/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Denied. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed March 26, 2001, and placed on the docket as Case No. 00-9137. 01-05549
05/21/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for a writ of ceritorari is denied. (No action required.) 01-08390