judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AUNDREY D. BURNO V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 06-CO-0488
Short Caption:AUNDREY D. BURNO V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Lead: 97-CF-1698 Consolidated:06-CO-0488
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL371-96Filed Date:03/20/2006

Opening Event Date:03/20/2006Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/16/2007
Argued/Submitted:04/30/2008
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/03/2008

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAundrey D. Burno N
Sydney Jean HoffmannNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/20/2006NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/26/2006ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 97-CF-1698 and 06-CO-488 are consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that the Clerk of the Superior Court shall prepare and transmit the record index and record copies in appeal in appeal no. 06-CO-488 to this court forthwith. F/O that appellant's consolidated brief shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (ETW)
06/05/2006COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS Granted
06/08/2006RECORD INDEX (06CO488)
06/08/2006RECORD COPIES (06CO488)
06/27/2006ORDERED that the motion of counsel for appellant is granted and the appearance of Jenifer Wicks, Esquire, is hereby withdrawn, and Sydney J. Hoffman, Esquire, is appointed to represent appellant herein. Jenifer Wicks, Esquire, shall transmit all documents pertaining to this appeal to newly-appointed counsel forthwith. F/O that appellant's brief shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (ETW)
08/04/2006APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until October 5, 2006 (no oppo)
08/11/2006 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief shall be filed on or before October 5, 2006. (GP)
10/03/2006APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until March 5, 2007 (no oppo)
10/05/2006 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief shall be filed on or before March 5, 2007. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (GP)
03/05/2007APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION to compel trial counsel to communicate with appellate counsel AND unopposed related MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE THE BRIEF LW
03/06/2007TMC - appellant's motion to compel and to enlarge time to file the brief
03/27/2007 ORDERED that appellant's MOTION TO COMPEL is GRANTED and Robert D. Scott, Esquire, shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, contact Sydney Hoffman, Esquire, and transmit all requested information and file proof of compliance with this court. It is *****MORE*****
03/27/2007 FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OT IME TO FILE HIS BRIEF is GRANTED and the brief of appellant shall be filed witin 40 days after receipt of the necessary information from Robert D. Scott, Esquire. (BRTHSC)
04/10/2007RECEIVED - ltr to prior Atty Mr. Hoffman from present counsel Scott.
04/12/2007 On FURTHER CONSIDERATION of this court's March 27, 2007, order directing Robert Scott, Esq., to contact present counsel and to file proof of compliance by April 6, 2007, and the copy of the letter sent by Robert Scott, Esq. to Sydney Hoffman, Esq., received by this court on April 10, 2007, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (BY: ETW) lw
05/22/2007APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 6/12/07. no oppo
05/23/2007APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD w/pleadings attached (no oppo)
05/25/2007 On consideration of the unopposed motion of appellant to supplement the record with the lodged document that was part of the record in the trial court, and the unopposed motion of appellant for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion of appellant to supplement the record is granted and the lodged document will be forwarded to the Appeals Coordinator's Office for transmittal to this court as a supplemental record. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of appellant for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix is granted and the brief and limited appendix of appellant shall be filed on or before June 12, 2007. (GP)
06/11/2007SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #16 (docket entries)
06/12/2007APPELLANT'S BRIEF
06/12/2007APPENDIX (attached to brief)
07/13/2007APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 30 days no oppo
07/19/2007 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before August 16, 2007. (GP)
08/16/2007APPELLEE'S BRIEF
08/16/2007BRIEFS COMPLETED
09/04/2007APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF until 9/11/07 (dwm) (pii) no oppo
09/05/2007 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the reply brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and appellant's reply brief shall be filed on or before September 11, 2007. (pii)
09/12/2007APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF no oppo
09/12/2007RECEIVED - aplt's reply brief.
09/14/2007 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to late file the lodged reply brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the lodged reply brief is filed. (GP)
11/06/2007FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
01/31/2008 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the months of April 2008 thru June 2008, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by February 19, 2008 of specific dates during that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. Counsel must continue to advise the court of availabilities for subsequent months until this case is in fact set for argument. Note that the calendar is prepared approximately two months in advance, e.g. January calendar set for release at the end of November. The court does not encourage the filing of motions to postpone a scheduled argument. If you do seek a change in a scheduled argument date, your motion should both indicate the opponent's position with respect to your request and alternative dates when you and opposing counsel would be available. You may call the Calendar Clerk prior to filing such a motion for information on dates in the scheduled month when the courtroom is available.(aj) Garland Pinkston, Jr. Clerk
02/08/2008LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING
03/06/2008CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
04/24/2008CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28
04/28/2008CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28
04/30/2008FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/30/2008ARGUED before Judges Ruiz, Farrell, Terry Sydney Jean Hoffmann, Esq. for Appellant Florence Pan, Esq. for Appellee
08/07/2008AFFIRMED Opinion (Ruiz, Farrell, Terry) and Judgment affirming the judgments of conviction.
09/03/2008MANDATE ISSUED