judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KIM KELLY V. CRAWFORD EDGEWOOD MANAGERS

Case Information: 11-CV-0210
Short Caption:KIM KELLY V. CRAWFORD EDGEWOOD MANAGERSClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB18067-10Filed Date:02/18/2011

Opening Event Date:02/18/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/14/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/24/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/28/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/06/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKim Kelly Y
Beth Mellen HarrisonYY
John C. KeeneyNN
Julie H. BeckerNN
AppelleeCrawford Edgewood ManagersN
Emilie FairbanksNY
Jonathan R. SchumanYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/18/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (4-pgs/tape 9/30/10 proc.) w/cd
03/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (44-pgs/tape 11/30/10 proc.)
03/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (40-pgs/tape 12/23/10 proc.)
03/14/2011RECORD INDEX
03/14/2011RECORD COPIES
03/14/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/16/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on February 18, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was granted in forma pauperis status in the trial court, and it further appearing that transcript may be needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
03/30/2011NOTICE RECEIVED- regarding transcripts w/defendant's motion for preparation of expedited appeal transcripts without cost to defendant - (MAT) attached (RT-NEEDED/RT-REQUESTED for 9/30/10, 11/30/10 & 12/23/10) (elp) **SEE 3/10/11, ENTRIES FOR TRANSCRIPTS FILED ABOVE (elp)
03/31/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
05/10/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
05/10/2011APPENDIX
05/10/2011APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD
06/02/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion to supplement the record, and it appearing that appellant seeks to supplement the record on appeal with documents that were not part of the record in the underlying matter in the trial court, it is ORDERED that the motion to supplement the record is denied. See D.C. App. R. 10 (a); Cobb v. Standard Drug Co., 453 A.2d 110, 112 (D.C. 1982). It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's brief remains due to be filed with this court on or before June 14, 2011. (ETW) elp
06/15/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 6/24/11
06/20/2011 On consideration of appellee's consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before June 24, 2011. (JAC) elp
06/24/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
06/24/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
07/22/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
08/10/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
09/14/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
09/26/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/28/2012FiledArgued Before Blackburne-Rigsby,Easterly Beth Mellen Harrison Esq., appellant Jonathan R. Schuman Esq.,for appellee
11/02/2012FiledStipulation To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant Kelly, Appellee Crawford Edgewood Managers)
11/14/2012FiledDismissed
12/06/2012FiledMandate