judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES P. MCGRATH V. WACHOVIA BANK

Case Information: 11-CV-0211
Short Caption:JAMES P. MCGRATH V. WACHOVIA BANKClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB7218-08Filed Date:02/18/2011

Opening Event Date:02/18/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/01/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/30/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames P. Mcgrath NPro SeN
AppelleeWachovia BankN
Grady C. Frank NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/18/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/09/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on February 18, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
03/21/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (NO-RT NEEDED FOR THIS APPEAL) (elp)
04/01/2011RECORD INDEX
04/01/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/04/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
04/05/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - motion to file (LODGED) oppo
04/13/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN OPPOSITION(Titled as: Motion for Leave to File Reply)dwm
04/13/2011RECEIVED- aplt's opposition to Motion for Summary Affirmance of the Judgment of the Superior Court request for denial of sam and for affirmation of aplt's appeal before the court dated 2/18/11 dwm
06/08/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the OPPOSITION. It is ****MORE****
06/08/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION
06/08/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED. SEE HARDCOPY It is ****MORE*****
06/08/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal IS AFFIRMED. (RZTHNB)
06/30/2011MANDATE ISSUED