judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GAFFORD VS. ROBERTS

Case Information: 34945
Short Caption:GAFFORD VS. ROBERTSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9901186UClassification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/28/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/11/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
10/11/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09786
10/13/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/25/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 99-10426
10/28/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 99-10571
10/28/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/18/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-02579
03/15/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-04061
03/15/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/24/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 20, 2000.