judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DERRICK R. PARKHURST v. EDDIE WILSON, Warden of the Wyoming State Penitentiary, and BRUCE A. SALZBURG, the Attorney General of the State of Wyoming

Case Heading (S-09-0218)
Case Number:S-09-0218Case Docketed On:10/23/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Habeas Corpus
Short Title:DERRICK R. PARKHURST v. EDDIE WILSON, Warden of the Wyoming State Penitentiary, and BRUCE A. SALZBURG, the Attorney General of the State of Wyoming
Full Title:DERRICK R. PARKHURST, Petitioner, v. EDDIE WILSON, Warden of the Wyoming State Penitentiary, and BRUCE A. SALZBURG, the Attorney General of the State of Wyoming, Respondents.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerDerrick Raymond Parkhurst Pro Se
RespondentEddie WilsonBruce A. Salzburg
David L. Delicath
RespondentAttorney General's Office - Attorney GeneralBruce A. Salzburg
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/23/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/23/2009Motion - In forma pauperisMotionIn forma pauperisFinal
10/23/2009Petition - Writ - habeas corpus. Petitioner failed to serve motion and petition on counsel for respondents. Called AG to advise them of this filingPetitionWrit - habeas corpusFinal
11/03/2009Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
11/04/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas CorpusEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/10/2009Order - Petition for review - denyOrderPetition for review - denyFinal
11/10/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/13/2009Event - Rejected Filing. Received "Answer to Motion to Dismiss." Returned to petitioner without filing.EventRejected FilingFinal