judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

REIMER VS. CRYSTAL TOWER C/W 35288/35289

Case Information: 34940
Short Caption:REIMER VS. CRYSTAL TOWER C/W 35288/35289Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:34940*, 35288 , 35289 Related Case(s): 35288 , 35289 , 38482
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9601367Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/26/1999 / Piscevich, MargoSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/07/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Mark H. Gunderson, Ltd.-- check no. 11351 ($100) and check no. 11352 ($100).
10/07/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09708
10/13/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/11/96, 5/18/98, 12/14/98, 7/21/99 to 7/30/99, and 9/3/99. To Court Reporter: Sierra Nevada Reporters 99-09947
10/25/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter regarding docketing statement. 99-10461
10/26/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Margo Piscevich. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/04/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 7/11/96, 5/18/98, 12/14/98, 7/21/99 to 7/30/99, and 9/3/99. Court Reporter: Sierra Nevada Reporters. 99-10836
12/07/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Representing appellant as co-counsel: Laxalt & Nomura, and Katherine J. MacKenzie. 99-12243
12/22/1999MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Stipulation to Consolidate Appeals and Cross-Appeal and to Establish Briefing Schedule (Nos. 34940, 35288, 35289). 99-13060
12/30/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 on cross-appeal from Laxalt & Nomura, Ltd.--check no. 006464.
12/30/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. 99-13414
12/30/1999MotionFiled Motion. 99-13448
01/07/2000Notice/Outgoing Letter.
01/25/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. We hereby consolidate for all appellate purposes the appeals and cross-appeals in docket numbers 34940, 35288 and 35289. We suspend briefing in these consolidated appeals and cross-appeals pending conclusion of the settlement conference and order of this court. Nos. 34940, 35288, 35289. 00-01169
05/31/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-09145
05/31/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant/cross-respondent and respondent/cross-appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
06/09/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Appellant/Cross-Respondent (00-09802) placed in 34940 correspondence file. (Nos. 34940, 35288 & 35289). 00-09802
06/20/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave to File Docketing Statement of Cross-Appellant/Respondent. Nos. 34940, 35288, 35289. 00-10587
07/11/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. We grant respondents/cross-appellants' motion for leave to file the docketing statement. Respondents/cross-appellants attached a proposed docketing statement to their motion. However, the proposed docketing statement was not signed by counsel. Respondents/cross-appellants shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file a properly executed docketing statement. Upon the filing of the docketing statement this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdicional review of these appeals and cross-appeals. Appellants/cross-respondents: 15 days to file a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request in Docket Nos. 35288 and 35289. Respondents/cross-appellants: 15 days to file a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request in each of these cross-appeals. Appellants/cross-respondents: 120 days to file and serve a single opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for respondents/cross-appellants-Lemons firm and Laxalt firm). Nos. 34940, 35288, 35289. 00-11892
07/12/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. (Nos. 34940, 35288 & 35289.) 00-12027
07/14/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (Appellant/Cross-Respondent) Transcripts requested: same transcripts requested by Appellants in Case No. 34940 on 10/13/99. To Court Reporters: Sierra Nevada Reporters, Kristine A. Bokelmann, Cindy Lee Brown, Karen Yates, Denise Phipps and Kate Ramage. (Nos. 34940, 35288 and 35289). 00-12222
07/21/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Respondents/Cross-Appellants. 00-12668
10/09/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 28, 1999. Court Reporter: Denise Phipps. Nos. 34940/35288/35289. 00-17835
11/06/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellants (Reimer and Western) shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why their appeals in Docket Nos. 34940, 35288 and 35289 should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents (Crystal and Diullo) shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why their cross-appeals in Docket Nos. 34940, 35288 and 35289 should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The briefing schedule in these appeals shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Nos. 34940, 35288, 35289. 00-19445
12/06/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellants Jeffrey Reimer and Western Colorprint, Inc. Nos. 34940/35288/35289. 00-21332
12/06/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. from Respondents/Cross Appellants. Nos. 34940/35288/35289. Doc. No. 00-21337 00-21337
01/09/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellants' Supplemental Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 34940/35288/35289. 01-00496
06/20/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER these appeals and cross-appeals DISMISSED." fn5[It appears that the parties may perfect an appeal by filing timely notices of appeal from the final judgment. As the parties have already gone through the settlement program under NRAP 16 in these appeals and cross-appeals, the parties may request exemption from the settlement program in any subsequent appeal from the final judgment.] NNP01A-MS/DA/RR. Nos. 34940/35288/35289 01-10387
06/25/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Entry of Order (Order Dismissing Appeal filed on 06/20/01). Nos. 34940/35288/35289). 01-10656
07/17/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-10507
07/17/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/25/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 18, 2001. 01-10507