judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MOORE (RYAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34939
Short Caption:MOORE (RYAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35030 , 44211 , 44983 , 60116
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR980900Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/10/2001 at 9:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:04/10/2001How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/07/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/07/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09704
11/17/1999Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. certified copy of order filed in district court on November 10, 1999, appointing Washoe County Public Defender as counsel for appellant. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel). 99-11438
12/03/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: Trial (no dates requested). To Court Reporter: R. Walker. 99-12105
12/06/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-12187
12/17/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 08/11/99; 08/12/99; and 08/13/99 roceedings: Court Reporter: Lee M. Bahr. 99-12833
12/30/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: August 10, 1999. Court Reporter: Randi Lee Walker. 99-13409
03/21/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: April 19, 2000. 00-04504
04/20/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-06376
04/24/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before May 19, 2000. 00-06556
05/22/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 5/19/00. 00-08463
05/22/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 3. 00-08465
06/23/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: July 21, 2000. 00-10737
07/18/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 7/17/00. 00-12369
02/26/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on April 10, 2001, at 9:00 a.m. (NNP01A-MS/RR/DA)
03/26/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
04/10/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP01A-MS/RR/DA
04/11/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. To Washoe County Clerk regarding the transmission of Audio Cassettes.
07/25/2001Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Reversed in part and remanded." Before Shearing, Agosti and Rose, JJ. Per Curiam. 117 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 52. NNP01A 01-12582
08/21/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Exhibits: State's Exhibits 1, 2, 3 and 4 (audio cassette tapes) this day. 01-13021
08/21/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/04/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 29, 2001. 01-13021