judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BARBARA L. MAGIN, as trustee of the Barbara L. Magin trust u/t/a dated June 30, 1995 v. SOLITUDE HOMEOWNER'S, INC., a Wyoming non-profit corporation

Case Heading (S-09-0217)
Case Number:S-09-0217Case Docketed On:10/22/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Extraordinary Relief
Short Title:BARBARA L. MAGIN, as trustee of the Barbara L. Magin trust u/t/a dated June 30, 1995 v. SOLITUDE HOMEOWNER'S, INC., a Wyoming non-profit corporation
Full Title:BARBARA L. MAGIN, as trustee of the Barbara L. Magin trust u/t/a dated June 30, 1995, Petitioner, v. SOLITUDE HOMEOWNER'S, INC., a Wyoming non-profit corporation, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerBarbara L. MaginGerard R. Bosch
RespondentSolitude Homeowner's Inc., a Wyoming non-profit corporationGlenn Martin Ford

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/22/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/22/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/22/2009Petition - Writ - reviewPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
11/06/2009Response/Objection - Petition for reviewResponse/ObjectionPetition for reviewFinal
11/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Response to Petition for Writ of ReviewEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/10/2009Order - Petition for review - denyOrderPetition for review - denyFinal
11/10/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal