judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARIE GILL V. BEST BUY STORES

Case Information: 11-AA-0214
Short Caption:MARIE GILL V. BEST BUY STORESClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES02967-10Filed Date:02/25/2011

Opening Event Date:02/25/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/19/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/08/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerMarie Gill YPro SeN
RespondentBest Buy StoresNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/25/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
02/25/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
03/07/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to February 25, 2011. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
03/07/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
04/12/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 7, 2011, directing respondent to identify its counsel within 30 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that respondent has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall result in respondent being prohibited from filing its brief. (JAC)
07/19/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/19/2011FiledRecord On Appeal w/1/21/11 hearing
07/22/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/09/2011FiledOrder directing motion, brief and appendix
10/17/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
10/17/2011FiledDismissed
10/26/2011FiledReceived order dated 10/17/2011 from post office marked "return to sender, no such street, unable to forward." (Petitioner) Address was checked on internet and it does exist. Order remailed.
11/08/2011FiledReceived - Order returned from post office sent to petitioner. Sent to file room. (Petitioner)
11/08/2011FiledMandate