judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ROBERT E. MCKEE, GENERAL CONTRACTOR INC. v. DAVID B. PATTERSON

Case: A-4501
A-4501
02/08/1954
Application for Writ of Error
ROBERT E. MCKEE, GENERAL CONTRACTOR INC.
DAVID B. PATTERSON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/22/1954Errata Filed
07/14/1954Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/13/1954Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/27/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/18/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
02/08/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/15/1956Letter Filed
10/22/1954Errata Filed
07/28/1954Response to Motion filed
07/14/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/13/1954Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/30/1954Dissenting opinion issued.
06/30/1954Opinion issued
03/10/1954Document received (See Remarks)
02/27/1954Reply to Response
02/18/1954Response to Petition
02/08/1954Document received (See Remarks)
02/08/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
David B. PattersonRespondent
Lieck and LieckAmicus Curiae
Robert E. McKee, General Contractor Inc.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information