judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANDERSON VS. SUTTLES

Case Information: 38356
Short Caption:ANDERSON VS. SUTTLESCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A423094Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/23/2001 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/21/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Joel F. Hansen & Associates--check no. 3173.
08/21/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14154
08/23/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/28/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-14558
08/30/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lansford W. Levitt.
10/25/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-18004
10/25/2001Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 01-18005
11/20/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b) NNP/CLK 01-19413
11/20/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.